Raval, Janak Kumar (CPSO#: 43142)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Mar 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Mar 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Advanced Imaging of South Bay Inc
c/o Providence LCMMC
4101 Torrance Boulevard
Torrance CA  90503
United States
Phone: (310) 303-5750

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 23 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANAK KUMAR RAVAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAVAL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 1985