Raval, Manojkumar Jyotindrarai (CPSO#: 80075)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 10 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Aug 2003 to 19 Sep 2003
Elective Trainee - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Colorectal Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Colorectal Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Sep 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Nov 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 04 Nov 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007