Ravenscroft, Alan Keith (CPSO#: 21750)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 07 Sep 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Sep 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: DocuDavit Solutions 28 Eugene Street Toronto ON M6B 3Z4 website: http://www.docudavit.com tel: 416.781.9083 fax: 1.888.297.9338 toll free: 1.888.781.9083
Instructions: see above
Date Received: 16 Feb 2011

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 1966
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 1968
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2003
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2011
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 07 Sep 2011