Ravichandiran, Mayoorendra (CPSO#: 101159)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Apr 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Scarborough Hospital General
Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAYOORENDRA RAVICHANDIRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAVICHANDIRAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Aug 2015 to 30 Aug 2015
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 07 Mar 2016 to 03 Apr 2016
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Apr 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2016