Raviele, Anelia Konstantinova (CPSO#: 94593)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 26 Jul 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bulgarian, English, Russian

Education:Medical Academy Sofia, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Department of Psychiatry
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Raviele Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 12 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Raviele ( CPSO# 94593 )

Business Address:
Lakeridge Health Oshawa
Department of Psychiatry
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone Number: (905) 576-8711

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 26 Jul 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 25 Jan 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 25 Jan 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 May 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 21 May 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Anelia  Konstantinova  Raviele  may  practice  medicine  independently  in
            psychiatry.