Ravikovich, Felix (CPSO#: 51472)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Nov 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Nov 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:First Leningrad Medical Institute, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1997
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 23 Apr 1997
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Nov 2010

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 04 Apr 1995
Summary:

 In a decision which was released in July 1995, the Discipline Committee found Dr. Ravikovich guilty 
 of professional misconduct, as defined in Ontario Regulation 448/80, as amended, in that he failed 
 to maintain the standard of practice of the profession, contrary to s. 27(21); and in that he made 
 a misrepresentation respecting a remedy, treatment or device, contrary to s. 27(24). The Committee 
 imposed the following penalty:

1.	Dr. Ravikovich was to be reprimanded, with the fact of the 
 reprimand to be recorded on the Register.

2.	Dr. Ravikovich's licence was to have a restriction 
 placed upon it for an indefinite period, prohibiting him from employing histamine for purposes of 
 diagnosis or therapy in the practice of medicine, except for the utilization of histamine as a 
 positive control in standard allergy skin testing.  This prohibition was also not to apply to the 
 employment by Dr. Ravikovich of standard allergen extracts in accordance with the accepted 
 standard of practice of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario.  Apart from the two 
 exceptions cited above, Dr. Ravikovich was not to employ for diagnostic or therapeutic purposes 
 any biological material which contained histamine.

3.	Dr. Ravikovich's licence was to be 
 suspended for a period of three months, the suspension to be itself suspended provided that the 
 Doctor submitted his practice to inspection by an inspector appointed by the Registrar, including 
 production of the records of his practice, within six months of this Order becoming final.

Dr. 
 Ravikovish(s appeal of the decision was dismissed.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: Appeal Dismissed
Appeal Decision Date: 17 Nov 1997
Hearing Date(s): Feb 07, 1994

Concerns

Source: Discipline Committee
Active Date: November 1, 2010
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking, effective November 1, 2010, by Dr. Felix Ravikovich to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

I, Dr. Felix Ravikovich, as a result of investigations and disciplinary proceedings regarding my care and conduct, have agreed to cease to practice medicine in all jurisdictions and not to re-apply for a certificate of registration.