Ravindran, Girija (CPSO#: 51473)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:University of Madras, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greater Peterborough Chamber
of Commerce
Unit 11
175 George Street North
Peterborough ON  K9J 3G6
Phone: (705) 743-5700
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Girija Ravindran Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Ravindran ( CPSO# 51473 )

Business Address:
11 - 175 George Street North
Peterborough ON  K9J 3G6
Phone Number: (705) 743-5700

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 19 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GIRIJA RAVINDRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAVINDRAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1985