Rawat, Brijendra Kumar (CPSO#: 62982)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 06 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 06 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Rajasthan University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 31 Oct 1991
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Nov 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Jun 2013