Rawkins, Sian Rhiannon (CPSO#: 76097)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Center for Addiction&Mental Health
Emergancy Department
250 Collegge Street
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: 4165358501
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sian R. Rawkins Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rawkins ( CPSO# 76097 )
Dr. J. Joannou ( CPSO# 84926 )

Business Address:
CAMH-College Site
250 College St.
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
Room 932
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800


Corporation Name: Jason A. Joannou Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rawkins ( CPSO# 76097 )
Dr. J. Joannou ( CPSO# 84926 )

Business Address:
CAMH-College Site
250 College St. Rm 534-B
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre of Addiction & Mental Health,- College Street Site Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SIAN RHIANNON RAWKINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAWKINS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006