Rawlinson, John (CPSO#: 61611)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Feb 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Oxford University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Hospital
Department of Radiology
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7R 4C4
Phone: (905) 632-3730
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Rawlinson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 24 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rawlinson ( CPSO# 61611 )

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Memorial Hospital
Dept of Radiology
1230 North Shore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7R 4C4
Phone Number: (905) 632-3730

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Atikokan General Hospital Atikokan
Bluewater Health Sarnia
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
Manitouwadge General Hospital Manitouwadge
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Rainy River Site-Riverside Health Care Facilities Rainy River
Red Lake Margaret Cochenour Memorial Hospital Red Lake
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 May 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN RAWLINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAWLINSON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Feb 1997