Raxlen, Bernard David (CPSO#: 20492)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 15 Aug 1988

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1966
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1966
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 22 Jan 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 1984
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Aug 1988