Ray, Amitabha (CPSO#: 80902)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Nov 2004

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Nov 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Calcutta, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 May 2004 to 08 Jul 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 09 Jul 2004 to 30 Nov 2004
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2004