Ray, Avi Andrew (CPSO#: 79152)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Court Medical Centre
Suite 206
1 Quarry Ridge
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 728-2280 Ext. 5
Fax: (705) 728-0033
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Andrew Ray Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 19 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ray ( CPSO# 79152 )

Business Address:
206 - 1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 728-9172

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AVI ANDREW RAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008