Ray, Jamie Nicole Calhoun (CPSO#: 100218)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Petawawa Centennial Health Center
154 Civic Centre Road
Petawawa, ON
Petawawa ON  K8H 3H5
Phone: 613-687-7641
Fax: 613-687-6808
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jamie Ray Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ray ( CPSO# 100218)

Business Address:
Pembroke Regional Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
705 MacKay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 732-2811

Business Address:
Petawawa Centennial Health Center
154 Civic Centre Road
Petawawa ON  K8H 8H5
Phone Number: (613) 687-7641

Business Address:
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 432-4851

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMIE NICOLE CALHOUN RAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2015