Ray, Joel Geoffrey (CPSO#: 66553)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060 Ext. 77442
Fax: (416) 864-5485
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Joel G. Ray Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Ray ( CPSO# 66553 )

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOEL GEOFFREY RAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 1997 to 31 Aug 1998
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Oct 1998 to 31 Jan 1999
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 1997