Ray, Reema (CPSO#: 87819)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Hindi

Education:University of Calcutta, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1190 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1B4
Phone: (519) 255-9887
Fax: (519) 255-9544
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
Tayfour Campus
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Canada
Phone: (519) 257-5111
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Windsor Essex Community Health
Center
3320 College Avenue
Windsor ON  N9C 0E1
Canada
Phone: (519) 258-6002
Fax: (519) 258-7896
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Reema Ray Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 06 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ray ( CPSO# 87819 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare
1453 Prince Road
Windsor ON  N9C 3Z4
Phone Number: (519) 257-5111

Business Address:
1190 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1B4
Phone Number: (519) 255-9887

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel Dieu Grace Healthcare,Tayfour Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. REEMA RAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2007 to 23 Jan 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Jan 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2009