Rayar, Umesh (CPSO#: 52328)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Dec 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Dec 1986

Summary

Former Name: Canagarayar, Umeshwara Turiyananda (used until: 19 Sep 1985 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese, Tamil

Education:University of Ceylon, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
178 John Street
Apartment 208
Brampton ON  L6W 2A4
Phone: (905) 450-0414
Fax: 905 450 0420
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Umesh Rayar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. U. Rayar ( CPSO# 52328 )

Business Address:
208 - 178 John Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2A4
Phone Number: (905) 450-0414

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 12 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. UMESH RAYAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAYAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Dec 1986