Rayes, Ziad Fahad A (CPSO#: 81845)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dept of Family Med & Polyclinics
M B C 62 King Faisal Specialist
Hospital & Research Centre
PO Box 3354
Riyadh 11211 11211
Saudi Arabia
Phone: +96614647272 Ext. 31861

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZIAD FAHAD A RAYES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAYES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2004 to 03 Oct 2004
PEAP - Resident - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Oct 2004 to 03 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Oct 2005 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Aug 2008
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2007