Rayevskiy, Alexey Olegovich (CPSO#: 87820)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Nov 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Oct 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Karaganda State Medical Academy, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
595 Bradley Avenue
London ON  N6E 3Z8
Phone: 519-680-1642
Fax: 519-680-0443
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

#1 Commissioners rd East
suit 111
London ON  N6C5Z3
Canada
Phone: 519-668-2400
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rayevskiy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Rayevskiy ( CPSO# 87820 )

Business Address:
Unit 111
1 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6C 5Z3
Phone Number: (519) 668-2400

Business Address:
595 Bradley Avenue
Suite A
London ON  N6E 3Z8
Phone Number: (519) 680-1642

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALEXEY OLEGOVICH RAYEVSKIY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAYEVSKIY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2007 to 23 Jan 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Jan 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2008 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2009