Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Raymond, Barbara Jean (CPSO#: 63779)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Public Health Agency of Canada
100 Colonnade Road
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K9
Phone: (613) 941-6084
Electoral District: 07

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA JEAN RAYMOND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAYMOND is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1992