Raymond, Elin Louise (CPSO#: 71186)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 311
658 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 5B9
Phone: (416) 466-2360
Fax: (416) 466-5076
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Hannam Fertility Centre
160 Bloor st. East
Toronto ON  M4W 3R2
Canada
Phone: (416) 595-1521
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elin Raymond Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Raymond ( CPSO# 71186 )

Business Address:
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Business Address:
311 - 658 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 5B9
Phone Number: (416) 466-2360

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIN LOUISE RAYMOND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAYMOND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2003