Raymond, Francois (CPSO#: 53196)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Laval University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Nuclear Medicine Department
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8528
Fax: (613) 737-8705
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

713 chemin Montréal
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Canada
Phone: 613-746-4621 Ext. 4556
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Nuclear Medicine Effective: 24 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FRANCOIS RAYMOND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAYMOND is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1988