Raymond, Louise (CPSO#: 67043)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 02 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 02 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - General Pathology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - General Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Apr 1999
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2000
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002