Raymond, Marc Real (CPSO#: 72506)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Strathroy Middlesex Gen Hospital
Suite 343
395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4
Phone: (519) 245-3888
Fax: (519) 245-3889
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marc R. Raymond Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Raymond ( CPSO# 72506 )

Business Address:
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital
343 - 395 Carrie Street
Strathroy ON  N7G 3J4
Phone Number: (519) 245-3888

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARC REAL RAYMOND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAYMOND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003