Raymond, Michele (CPSO#: 72611)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hopital Saint Vincent
60 cambridge
Ottawa ON  K1R 7A5
Phone: (613) 562-6262 Ext. 2215
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Perley Rideau Veterans HC
1750 Russell Road
Ottawa ON  K1G 5Z6
Canada
Phone: 613-526-7171
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Residence Saint Louis
879 Hiawatha park
Orleans ON  K1C 2Z6
Canada
Phone: 613-562-6262 Ext. 2680
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bruyere Continuing Care-St Vincent Hospital Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHELE RAYMOND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAYMOND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 05 Sep 2000 to 04 Sep 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Care of the Elderly

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2000