Rayner, Harry Ledingham (CPSO#: 59187)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 16 Aug 1991

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Oncology Effective: 08 Sep 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 26 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Mar 1975 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Aug 1991