Rayson, Daniel (CPSO#: 61180)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Jul 2000


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Dalhousie University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 10 Sep 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jul 2000