Raza, Samir (CPSO#: 93805)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
Room A3-15
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone: 905-521-2100 Ext. 43834
Fax: 905-575-7320
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samir Raza Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 30 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Raza ( CPSO# 93805 )

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3N5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
1112 St. Andrews Drive
Midland ON  L4R 4P4
Phone Number: (705) 526-1300

Business Address:
Juravinski Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
Room A3-15
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SAMIR RAZA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAZA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 06 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014