Razack, Jameel Khali Ishmile (CPSO#: 28615)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 1976

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 1976

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of the West Indies, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pape Medical Centre
Suite 205
751 Pape Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 3T1
Phone: (416) 461-1822
Fax: (416) 778-8779
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. Razack Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Razack ( CPSO# 28615 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
751 Pape Avenue
Toronto ON  M4K 3T1
Phone Number: (416) 461-1822

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 02 Jul 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMEEL KHALI ISHMILE RAZACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAZACK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 1976