Razack, Saleem Idris (CPSO#: 64437)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 02 Apr 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1991
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Apr 1993