Razack, Vanessa Amina (CPSO#: 97076)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Dec 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Paediatric Emergency
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-5418
Fax: (416) 813-5285
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Vanessa A. Razack Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 7 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Connecticut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Paediatric Emergency Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Aug 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 12 Jul 2013

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2013 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Vanessa  Amina  Razack  may  practise medicine independently in paediatric
            emergency medicine, only.