Razak, Fahad (CPSO#: 90866)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Li Ka Shing Knowledge Institute
209 Victoria St - Room 345
Toronto ON M5B1T8
Canada
Cambridge ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 360-4000
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. FAHAD RAZAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAZAK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013