Razavi, Jalees Mohammed Sadiq Hussain Khan (CPSO#: 69690)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Dec 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:King Saud University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO BOX 2415 STN MAIN
WORKERS' COMPENSATION BOARD
Edmonton AB  T5J 2S5
Phone: (403) 517-6000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Occupational Medicine Effective: 24 Nov 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JALEES MOHAMMED SADIQ HUSSAIN KHAN RAZAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAZAVI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Sep 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 01 Sep 1997
Resident 4 - Occupational Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Sep 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Dec 2008