Razvi, Yasar Syed (CPSO#: 74759)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Oct 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Georgetown Medical Associates
199 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 0E3
Phone: (905) 873-3000
Fax: (905) 873-0800
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Yasar Razvi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Razvi ( CPSO# 74759 )

Business Address:
1 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 4W4
Phone Number: (905) 873-0111

Business Address:
199 Princess Anne Drive
Georgetown ON  L7G 0E3
Phone Number: (905) 873-3185

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. YASAR SYED RAZVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAZVI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2002