Razzaque, Asad (CPSO#: 68942)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Aug 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Battlefield Medical Centre
72 King Street West
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 1H8
Phone: (905) 662-6959
Fax: (905) 662-5816
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Razzaque Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Razzaque ( CPSO# 68942 )

Business Address:
Battlefield Medical Centre
72 King Street West
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 1H8
Phone Number: (905) 662-6959

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ASAD RAZZAQUE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAZZAQUE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1997