Rea, Elizabeth Helen (CPSO#: 59812)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1989

Summary

Former Name: Rea, Elizabeth (used until: 18 Jun 1990 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Public Health
10th Floor
277 Victoria Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W2
Phone: (416) 525-3794
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Sokolov Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 21 2014


Corporation Name: Dr. Stephen Sokolov Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sokolov ( CPSO# 59135 )
Dr. E. Rea ( CPSO# 59812 )

Business Address:
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Room 1148
250 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH HELEN REA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1989