Rea, John Coates (CPSO#: 54203)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Oct 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Suite 104
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone: (705) 789-2355
Fax: (705) 789-1051
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Rea Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rea ( CPSO# 54203 )

Business Address:
104 - 348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone Number: (705) 789-2355

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1986 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN COATES REA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1986