Read, Brandi Louise (CPSO#: 86461)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 798-5555
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Nov 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRANDI LOUISE READ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. READ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2016