Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Read, Nancy Elizabeth (CPSO#: 62068)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Regional Cancer Centre
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone: (519) 685-8650
Fax: (519) 685-8627
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nancy E. Read Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 04 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Read ( CPSO# 62068 )

Business Address:
London Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiology
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 685-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NANCY ELIZABETH READ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. READ is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 1991