Read, Robert Miller (CPSO#: 47107)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 12 May 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 12 May 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 20 Nov 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1964
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1965
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1966
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1967
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 1998
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 12 May 2007