Reade, Clare Justine Marcotte (CPSO#: 84313)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Juravinski Cancer Centre
Hamilton Health Sciences
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone: (905) 387-9495
Fax: (905) 575-6343
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Clare Reade Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Reade ( CPSO# 84313 )

Business Address:
Juravinski Cancer Centre
Hamilton Health Sciences
699 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 5C2
Phone Number: (905) 389-5688

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Gynecologic Oncology Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CLARE JUSTINE MARCOTTE READE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. READE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2011