Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Reade, Elizabeth Ann (CPSO#: 51476)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Apr 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Apr 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
161 Hume Road, RR#1
Puslinch, ON N0B2J0
Puslinch ON  N0B 2J0
Phone: (519) 836-6386
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David Wright and Dr. Elizabeth Reade Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 08 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wright ( CPSO# 65634 )
Dr. E. Reade ( CPSO# 51476 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 02 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH ANN READE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. READE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Jan 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 1992