Reading, Sarah Hope (CPSO#: 58534)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Dec 1996

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: Lovell, Sarah Hope (used until: 31 Mar 1996 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Oct 1989 to 31 Dec 1989
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 22 Oct 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 1996