Rebane, Thomas Mart (CPSO#: 51477)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1980

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Estonian

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
71 King Street West
Suite 203
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Phone: (905) 279-0800
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 Ronson Dr
suite 204
Toronto ON  M9W 5Z9
Canada
Phone: (416) 740-2550
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

5160 Explorer Drive, Unit 14
Mississauga ON  L4W 4T7
Canada
Phone: (416) 740-2500
Fax: (416) 740-2502
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: T. Rebane Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Rebane ( CPSO# 51477 )

Business Address:
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5
Phone Number: (416) 740-2500

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
203 - 71 King Street West
Mississauga ON  L5B 4A2
Phone Number: (905) 279-0800

Business Address:
104 - 200 Ronson Drive
Toronto ON  M9W 5Z9
Phone Number: (416) 740-2500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 02 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS MART REBANE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REBANE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1985