Rebeyka, Ivan Michael (CPSO#: 42780)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 Jun 1979 to 16 Jun 1980
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 5 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jun 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 May 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jul 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2005