Rebuck, David Aaron (CPSO#: 85967)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 21 Dec 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Mar 2007 to 03 Jun 2007
Elective Trainee - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2015