Reddick, Deborah Susan (CPSO#: 67512)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Dec 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Dec 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bayfield Treatment Centres
30 Country Road 39
Consecon Ontario KOK ITO
Toronto ON  K0K 1T0
Phone: 613 392 3551 Ext. 227
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Portage Rehabilitation Treatment Ce
RR 1
Box 209
Elora ON  N0B 1S0
Canada
Phone: 519 846 0945
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 18 Nov 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DEBORAH SUSAN REDDICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REDDICK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 04 Oct 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Feb 1999
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 18 Feb 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 1999