Reddy, D Nageshwar (CPSO#: 77079)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 27 Oct 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Oct 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kurnool Medical College, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Sep 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Oct 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 27 Oct 2017