Reddy, Eswaravaka Rajaram (CPSO#: 57759)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Oct 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 28 Nov 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Sri Venkatesvara University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Niagra Health System
St.Catharines Site
1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 684-7271
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. E.R. Reddy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Reddy ( CPSO# 57759 )

Business Address:
Niagara Health Services
St. Catharines Site
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 684-7271

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara-on-the-Lake Hospital Site,of the Niagara Health System Niagara-on-the-lake

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 23 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 1986
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2016
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 05 Apr 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 05 Apr 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from April 5, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Eswaravaka Rajaram
            Reddy, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Reddy to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. ESWARAVAKA RAJARAM REDDY
                                          ("Dr. Reddy")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Reddy, certificate of registration number 57759, am a member of
                  the College.  The College has received information regarding my standard
                  of practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Reddy, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7214946 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my diagnostic
                  radiology practice. On November 28, 2016, I entered into an interim
                  undertaking to the College to address the College's concern about
                  protecting the public while the Investigation was ongoing (my "Interim
                  Undertaking").

            (4)   I, Dr. Reddy, acknowledge that, after the College receives an original
                  copy of this Undertaking as signed by me, my Interim Undertaking will
                  cease to be in effect and no further action will be taken on the
                  Investigation. 

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (5)   I, Dr. Reddy, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately. 

            (6)   Practice Restrictoins


                  (a)   I, Dr. Reddy, undertake that I will not engage in any of the
                        following areas of practice: 
                  
                        i.    interpretation of  computed tomography scans ("CTs");
                        ii.   interpretation of mammography;
                        iii.   interpretation of nuclear medicine studies; or
                        iv.   interpretation of magnetic resonance imaging scans ("MRIs").
                  
            (7)   Clinical Supervision

                  (a)   I, Dr. Reddy, undertake to practise under the guidance of a
                        clinical supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for six (6) months ("Clinical Supervision"), such
                        period to commence immediately after my execution of this
                        Undertaking or, if I have not yet resumed practice at the time that
                        I execute this Undertaking, such period to commence immediately
                        upon my resuming practice. 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Reddy, acknowledge that I have reviewed the Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)'s undertaking, attached hereto as Appendix "A", and
                        understand what is required of the Clinical Supervisor(s). The
                        Clinical Supervisor(s) will, at minimum: 
                  
                        (i)   Facilitate the education program set out in the
                              Individualized Education Plan ("IEP"), attached hereto as
                              Appendix "B";
                  
                        (ii)  Meet with me at my Practice Location, or another location
                              approved by the College, at least once every two (2) weeks
                              for two (2) months, and at least once a month for a further
                              four months;
                  
                        (iii) Review at least twenty (20) of my patient charts at every
                              meeting;
                  
                        (iv)  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews;
                  
                        (v)   Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        (vi)  Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        (vii) Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              quarter, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Reddy, acknowledge that the charts reviewed shall be
                        selected by the Clinical Supervisor(s) based on the educational
                        needs identified in the IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B", as
                        well as the areas of concern identified in the report(s) of the
                        quality review received by the College on February 9, 2016 and of
                        the external review dated November 16, 2016, and concerns that may
                        arise during the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Reddy, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, and to abide by
                        the recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Reddy, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Reddy, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Reddy, undertake that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (7)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.
                  
                  (h)   I, Dr. Reddy, acknowledge that if I am required to cease to
                        practise as a result of section (7)(g) above this will constitute a
                        term, condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and
                        that term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (8)   Professional Education

                  (a)   I, Dr. Reddy, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B",
                        including completing all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   Online e-learning modules from the American College of
                              Radiology on chest, gastrointestinal, genitourinary,
                              musculoskeletal and ultrasound imaging, to be completed
                              within six (6)  months of my execution of this Undertaking,
                              or, should any of these be unavailable, another program(s)
                              satisfactory to the College to be completed within the same
                              time frame; and
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Reddy, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Reddy, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
                  
            (9)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Reddy, undertake that, approximately three (3) months after
                        the completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (7)
                        above and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I
                        acknowledge that the Reassessment will include a chart review,
                        direct observation, an interview of myself, interviews with
                        colleagues and co-workers, and use of any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Reddy, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Reddy, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor(s) may
                        receive and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss
                        with the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Reddy, acknowledge that if I am of the view that any of the
                        Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will have thirty
                        (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within which
                        to provide the College with my submissions in this regard.  I
                        further acknowledge that thereafter, the ICR Committee will
                        consider my submissions and make a determination regarding whether
                        or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable and if
                        so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or
                        restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to
                        me.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Reddy, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (9)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Reddy, hereby consent to the following being included on the
                        public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code:
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (9)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (10)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Reddy, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Reddy, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and
                        patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Reddy, undertake that I will participate in a quality
                        assurance program at any hospital or facility where I practise
                        medicine, and that I will provide written confirmation that I will
                        be participating in such a program from the Chief of Staff, or a
                        colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location
                        ("Chief(s) of Staff") within twenty (20) days of my execution of
                        this Undertaking, or within twenty (20) days of my return to
                        practice, whichever is later.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Reddy, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP and/or any person who or institution
                        that may have relevant information, in order for the College to
                        monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Reddy, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent
                        form attached hereto as Appendix "C." 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (11)  I, Dr. Reddy, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Reddy, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (13)  I, Dr. Reddy, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (14)  I, Dr. Reddy, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief(s) of Staff, at any Practice Location.

            (15)  I, Dr. Reddy, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (16)  I, Dr. Reddy, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code.

            (17)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Reddy, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Reddy, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (17)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Reddy
                              engaged in professional misconduct or was incompetent in his
                              diagnostic radiology practice. As a result of the
                              investigation:
                  
                              *      Dr. Reddy must not engage in interpretation of
                                    computed tomography scans ("CTs"), mammography, nuclear
                                    medicine studies, or magnetic resonance imaging scans
                                    ("MRIs").
                              *      Dr. Reddy will practise under the guidance of a
                                    Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6
                                    months. 
                              *      Dr. Reddy will engage in professional education in
                                    chest, gastrointestinal, genitourinary, musculoskeletal
                                    and ultrasound imaging.
                              *      Dr. Reddy's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                                    selected by the College within approximately three (3)
                                    months of the end of the period of Clinical
                                    Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (18)  I, Dr. Reddy, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (19)  I, Dr. Reddy, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (20)  I, Dr. Reddy, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A" to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believes indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: April 5, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Eswaravaka Rajaram Reddy to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 5, 2017:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Reddy engaged in professional misconduct or was incompetent in his diagnostic radiology practice. As a result of the investigation:

• Dr. Reddy must not engage in interpretation of computed tomography scans (“CTs”), mammography, nuclear medicine studies, or magnetic resonance imaging scans (“MRIs”).

• Dr. Reddy will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 6 months.

• Dr. Reddy will engage in professional education in chest, gastrointestinal, genitourinary, musculoskeletal and ultrasound imaging.

• Dr. Reddy’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within approximately three (3) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.