Reddy, Hasini (CPSO#: 82002)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Mar 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neuropathology Effective: 21 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Oct 2004 to 14 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Oct 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neuropathology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neuropathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2009